Assembly | 09/19/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2017 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 3025.). | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2017 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 2472.) | ||
Senate | 06/29/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2017 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 7). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 1140.) | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 17). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2017 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | Introduced. To print. |