Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Page 6503.). | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 14). | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2018 | Introduced. |