Assembly | 06/29/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Page 2400.). | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | Amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2017 | Introduced. |