Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Page 4641.). | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2018 | Introduced. |