Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Page 5845.). | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | Introduced. |