|
09/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 892, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 6132.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 6979.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 4419.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4814.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4696.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|