|
09/29/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 933, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 6126.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6962.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 4382.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4301.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 4851.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|