|
09/13/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 6133.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 7062.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 4460.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4302.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 4822.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24 in T. & H. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 4718.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C., EQ., and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|