Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
August 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4347.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4302.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
May 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
April 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4719.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2018
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4367.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2018
|
Set for hearing March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|