|
09/26/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 787, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 5860.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6592.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4341.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4240.) (May 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 4851.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|