Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4405.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4302.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4745.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|