Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4405.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4302.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4818.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|