Assembly | 08/20/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2018 | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 4447.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4302.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4367.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2018 | Set for hearing March 13. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |