Senate | 05/25/2018 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2018 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |