Assembly | 06/07/2018 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2018 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4452.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4302.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2018 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4790.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |