Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4763.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4622.) (April 11). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |