California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1050 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 6, 2018
Bill March 21, 2018