California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1055 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2018

Amended

Bill August 9, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018