California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1073 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2018

Amended

Bill June 19, 2018
Bill March 15, 2018