|
09/11/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5690.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6481.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4333.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4785.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|