|
09/18/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 511, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5425.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6311.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4419.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
May 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4850.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2018
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|