|
09/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 893, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5957.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 6708.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 6473.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5008.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4788.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Set for hearing April 23 in P.E. & R. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|