|
09/23/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 734, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6963.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4453.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4303.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
April 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4626.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2018
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|