|
09/19/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 561, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 1. Page 6411.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 4348.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4303.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
April 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4719.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 4718.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|