LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1092
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1092
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1092
Action History
Senate
04/11/2018
April 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 4627.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
03/29/2018
Set for hearing April 10.
Senate
03/22/2018
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Senate
02/22/2018
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and N.R. & W.
Senate
02/14/2018
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
Senate
02/13/2018
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.