Senate | 05/25/2018 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2018 | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2018 | Set for hearing May 14. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4818.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/10/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |