|
07/16/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4786.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|