|
09/22/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 692, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 5861.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 6582.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 4230.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4556.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|