Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4380.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4304.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4822.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|