|
09/11/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 354, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5548.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6403.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4834.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4769.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4556.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|