California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB112 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2017

Amended

Bill September 11, 2017
Bill September 7, 2017