|
09/14/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 413, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 5628.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 5914.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Set for hearing August 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5536.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 6411.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 4350.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4304.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4850.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
April 17 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|