|
09/14/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 414, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5565.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6312.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4212.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4697.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4629.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
April 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2018
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|