California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1137 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/23/2018

                    Enrolled  August 23, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 16, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  June 14, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1137Introduced by Senator VidakFebruary 13, 2018 An act to add Section 714 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1137, Vidak. Veterans: professional licensing benefits.Existing law establishes the Department of Veterans Affairs, which is responsible for administering various programs and services for the benefit of veterans. Existing law establishes the Department of Consumer Affairs within the Business, Consumer Services, and Housing Agency. Existing law provides for a variety of state benefits to veterans.This bill would require the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Consumer Affairs to, in consultation with each other, take appropriate steps to increase awareness regarding professional licensing benefits available to veterans and their spouses, as specified.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 714 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read:714. (a) The Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Consumer Affairs shall both, in consultation with each other, take appropriate steps to increase awareness regarding professional licensing benefits available to veterans and their spouses.(b) The awareness efforts in subdivision (a) shall include, but not be limited to, both of the following:(1) Posting information and resources on each departments respective Internet Web site.(2) Including information about these benefits in any communications that these agencies have with veterans when it is appropriate.

 Enrolled  August 23, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 16, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  June 14, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 1137Introduced by Senator VidakFebruary 13, 2018 An act to add Section 714 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 1137, Vidak. Veterans: professional licensing benefits.Existing law establishes the Department of Veterans Affairs, which is responsible for administering various programs and services for the benefit of veterans. Existing law establishes the Department of Consumer Affairs within the Business, Consumer Services, and Housing Agency. Existing law provides for a variety of state benefits to veterans.This bill would require the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Consumer Affairs to, in consultation with each other, take appropriate steps to increase awareness regarding professional licensing benefits available to veterans and their spouses, as specified.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 23, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 21, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 16, 2018 Amended IN  Assembly  June 14, 2018

Enrolled  August 23, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  August 21, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  August 16, 2018
Amended IN  Assembly  June 14, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Bill No. 1137

Introduced by Senator VidakFebruary 13, 2018

Introduced by Senator Vidak
February 13, 2018

 An act to add Section 714 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SB 1137, Vidak. Veterans: professional licensing benefits.

Existing law establishes the Department of Veterans Affairs, which is responsible for administering various programs and services for the benefit of veterans. Existing law establishes the Department of Consumer Affairs within the Business, Consumer Services, and Housing Agency. Existing law provides for a variety of state benefits to veterans.This bill would require the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Consumer Affairs to, in consultation with each other, take appropriate steps to increase awareness regarding professional licensing benefits available to veterans and their spouses, as specified.

Existing law establishes the Department of Veterans Affairs, which is responsible for administering various programs and services for the benefit of veterans. Existing law establishes the Department of Consumer Affairs within the Business, Consumer Services, and Housing Agency. Existing law provides for a variety of state benefits to veterans.

This bill would require the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Consumer Affairs to, in consultation with each other, take appropriate steps to increase awareness regarding professional licensing benefits available to veterans and their spouses, as specified.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 714 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read:714. (a) The Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Consumer Affairs shall both, in consultation with each other, take appropriate steps to increase awareness regarding professional licensing benefits available to veterans and their spouses.(b) The awareness efforts in subdivision (a) shall include, but not be limited to, both of the following:(1) Posting information and resources on each departments respective Internet Web site.(2) Including information about these benefits in any communications that these agencies have with veterans when it is appropriate.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 714 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read:714. (a) The Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Consumer Affairs shall both, in consultation with each other, take appropriate steps to increase awareness regarding professional licensing benefits available to veterans and their spouses.(b) The awareness efforts in subdivision (a) shall include, but not be limited to, both of the following:(1) Posting information and resources on each departments respective Internet Web site.(2) Including information about these benefits in any communications that these agencies have with veterans when it is appropriate.

SECTION 1. Section 714 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

714. (a) The Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Consumer Affairs shall both, in consultation with each other, take appropriate steps to increase awareness regarding professional licensing benefits available to veterans and their spouses.(b) The awareness efforts in subdivision (a) shall include, but not be limited to, both of the following:(1) Posting information and resources on each departments respective Internet Web site.(2) Including information about these benefits in any communications that these agencies have with veterans when it is appropriate.

714. (a) The Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Consumer Affairs shall both, in consultation with each other, take appropriate steps to increase awareness regarding professional licensing benefits available to veterans and their spouses.(b) The awareness efforts in subdivision (a) shall include, but not be limited to, both of the following:(1) Posting information and resources on each departments respective Internet Web site.(2) Including information about these benefits in any communications that these agencies have with veterans when it is appropriate.

714. (a) The Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Consumer Affairs shall both, in consultation with each other, take appropriate steps to increase awareness regarding professional licensing benefits available to veterans and their spouses.(b) The awareness efforts in subdivision (a) shall include, but not be limited to, both of the following:(1) Posting information and resources on each departments respective Internet Web site.(2) Including information about these benefits in any communications that these agencies have with veterans when it is appropriate.



714. (a) The Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Consumer Affairs shall both, in consultation with each other, take appropriate steps to increase awareness regarding professional licensing benefits available to veterans and their spouses.

(b) The awareness efforts in subdivision (a) shall include, but not be limited to, both of the following:

(1) Posting information and resources on each departments respective Internet Web site.

(2) Including information about these benefits in any communications that these agencies have with veterans when it is appropriate.