|
09/18/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 512, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6053.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 9. Page 6801.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4454.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4304.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4852.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4700.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|