Assembly | 06/26/2018 | June 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2018 | June 12 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4939.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4818.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |