|
09/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 607, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6053.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6802.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
August 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4408.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4305.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
April 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4698.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|