Senate | 05/25/2018 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2018 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4722.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4605.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |