Senate | 05/25/2018 | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2018 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4746.) (April 18). | ||
Senate | 04/10/2018 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |