Assembly | 04/30/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4876.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4496.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |