Assembly | 06/26/2018 | June 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2018 | June 19 hearing: Heard for testimony only. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2018 | June 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5011.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2018 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4818.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |