Senate | 08/16/2018 | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/10/2018 | Set for hearing August 16. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | August 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/04/2018 | Set for hearing August 6. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4929.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | April 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |