|
09/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 608, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5565.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 6306.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 4219.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4746.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|