Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In committee: That the measure be held in committee pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6097.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 6885.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6884.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 6561.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Assembly Rule 63 and 69 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2018
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 24. Noes 0.) (March 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 9.) (September 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
(Corrected October 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
September 11 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2825.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2017
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1041.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|