Assembly | 06/11/2018 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2018 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 4459.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4306.) (May 25). | ||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2018 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | May 14 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | Set for hearing May 14. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4852.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |