Assembly | 06/14/2018 | June 20 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | June 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2018 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5014.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2018 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4789.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Set for hearing April 23 in P.E. & R. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |