Senate | 05/14/2018 | May 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | May 9 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2018 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |