Senate | 04/17/2018 | April 16 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | Set for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2018 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |