|
09/30/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 984, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5690.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 6473.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4761.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4677.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4418.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|