Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4412.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4306.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4622.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
March 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2018
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|